AR HB1738 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Notification that HB1738 is now Act 543
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Statutes Concerning Obtaining A Certificate Of Public Convenience And Necessity From The Arkansas Public Service Commission In Certain Circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Statutes Concerning Obtaining A Certificate Of Public Convenience And Necessity From The Arkansas Public Service Commission In Certain Circumstances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20HouseNotification that HB1738 is now Act 543
2019-03-19HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-03-18HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-03-18HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-03-18SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2019-03-18SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-12SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2019-03-12SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-12HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-11HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-07HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on ENERGY - JOINT
2019-03-07HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback