AR HB1737 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-12 - Notification that HB1737 is now Act 1211
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-12 - Notification that HB1737 is now Act 1211
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning Election Precincts And Ballot Reporting; To Define "precinct"; To Limit Precinct Size To Three Thousand (3,000) Registered Voters.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning Election Precincts And Ballot Reporting; To Define "precinct"; To Limit Precinct Size To Three Thousand (3,000) Registered Voters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-10 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 81 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-12 | House | Notification that HB1737 is now Act 1211 |
2013-04-11 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-04-10 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-04-10 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2013-04-06 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-04-04 | House | CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED |
2013-04-04 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-04-03 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-25 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-25 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-25 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-06 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2013-03-06 | House | Filed |