AR HB1730 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Notification that HB1730 is now Act 761
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Notification that HB1730 is now Act 761
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Allow An Authorizer To Transfer And Assign A Public Charter School's Charter Under The Arkansas Quality Charter Schools Act Of 2013.
Title
To Allow An Authorizer To Transfer And Assign A Public Charter School's Charter Under The Arkansas Quality Charter Schools Act Of 2013.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 79 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 79 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-05 | House | Notification that HB1730 is now Act 761 |
2019-04-03 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2019-04-02 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-04-02 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-03-25 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-03-19 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-03-07 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-03-06 | House | Filed |