AR HB1730 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Died in House at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Died in House at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Eliminate Excessive Government Regulation; To Create Systematic Review Of Old Rules; To Prevent Rules From Becoming Antiquated; And To Require Approval Of Old Rules By The Legislative Council.
Title
To Eliminate Excessive Government Regulation; To Create Systematic Review Of Old Rules; To Prevent Rules From Becoming Antiquated; And To Require Approval Of Old Rules By The Legislative Council.
Sponsors
Rep. Nate Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-26 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 59 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | House | Died in House at Sine Die adjournment. |
2015-03-31 | House | Returned From the Senate as requested. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Returned To the House as requested. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2015-03-26 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-03-25 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-03-11 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-11 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-06 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2015-03-06 | House | Filed |