AR HB1729 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Notification that HB1729 is now Act 1151
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Notification that HB1729 is now Act 1151
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Repeal Obsolete Laws Concerning Labor And Employment In Title 11 Of The Arkansas Code Of 1987.
Title
An Act To Repeal Obsolete Laws Concerning Labor And Employment In Title 11 Of The Arkansas Code Of 1987.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-08 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-11 | House | Notification that HB1729 is now Act 1151 |
2013-04-10 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-04-09 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-04-01 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-03-28 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-06 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-03-06 | House | Filed |