AR HB1728 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-13 - Notification that HB1728 is now Act 828
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Concerning The Operation Of A Prohibited Aircraft; And To Amend The Definition Of "aircraft".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Concerning The Operation Of A Prohibited Aircraft; And To Amend The Definition Of "aircraft".

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - Third Reading (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-13HouseNotification that HB1728 is now Act 828
2023-04-07HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2023-04-06HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2023-04-06HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2023-04-06SenateReturned to the House as Passed.
2023-04-06SenateRead the third time and passed.
2023-04-05SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2023-04-03SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE
2023-04-03SenateReceived from the House.
2023-04-03HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2023-03-30HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2023-03-27HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
2023-03-27HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback