AR HB1728 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - House Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - House Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Specify Minimum And Maximum Unemployment Benefits And To Amend Requirements For Receiving Unemployment Benefits For Discharge For Absenteeism, Misconduct, And Failure To Accept Suitable Work.
Title
An Act To Specify Minimum And Maximum Unemployment Benefits And To Amend Requirements For Receiving Unemployment Benefits For Discharge For Absenteeism, Misconduct, And Failure To Accept Suitable Work.
Sponsors
Rep. Davy Carter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | House Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment. | |
2011-03-16 | House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-16 | House Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-16 | House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. | |
2011-03-11 | House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-11 | House Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-11 | House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. | |
2011-02-28 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE | |
2011-02-28 | House Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2011/2011R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HB1728 |
Text | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2011/2011R/Bills/HB1728.pdf |