AR HB1725 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Inform The Public Of Health Risks Caused By Vapor Products, E-liquid Products, And Alternative Nicotine Products; And To Ensure The Safety Of Arkansas Youth.
Title
To Inform The Public Of Health Risks Caused By Vapor Products, E-liquid Products, And Alternative Nicotine Products; And To Ensure The Safety Of Arkansas Youth.
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Johnson [R] | Sen. Jim Petty [R] | Sen. Justin Boyd [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - House - Third Reading (Y: 89 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2023-04-04 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-04-03 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-04-03 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2023-04-03 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2023-03-30 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2023-03-27 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES |
2023-03-27 | House | Filed |