AR HB1725 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Notification that HB1725 is now Act 670
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Repeal Unused Provisions Of The Tax Code; To Repeal The Income Tax Credit For The Purchase Of A Cigarette Receptacle; And To Repeal A Provision Concerning Interest On Estate Tax Deficiencies And Overpayments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Repeal Unused Provisions Of The Tax Code; To Repeal The Income Tax Credit For The Purchase Of A Cigarette Receptacle; And To Repeal A Provision Concerning Interest On Estate Tax Deficiencies And Overpayments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseNotification that HB1725 is now Act 670
2019-04-02HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-04-01HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-04-01HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-04-01SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2019-04-01SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-27SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-03-25SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
2019-03-25SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-25HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-14HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-06HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
2019-03-06HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback