AR HB1718 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Notification that HB1718 is now Act 595
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Create The Arkansas Legal Tender Act; And To Reaffirm Gold And Silver Coin As Legal Tender.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Create The Arkansas Legal Tender Act; And To Reaffirm Gold And Silver Coin As Legal Tender.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - Third Reading (Y: 82 N: 8 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-11HouseNotification that HB1718 is now Act 595
2023-04-06HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2023-04-05HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2023-04-05HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2023-04-05SenateReturned to the House as Passed.
2023-04-05SenateRead the third time and passed.
2023-04-04SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2023-04-03SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
2023-04-03SenateReceived from the House.
2023-04-03HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2023-03-30HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-03-30HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2023-03-30HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2023-03-29HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2023-03-27HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
2023-03-27HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback