AR HB1718 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Notification that HB1718 is now Act 801
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Notification that HB1718 is now Act 801
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Provisions Of The Arkansas Trust Code Concerning Creditor Claims Against Property Held In Spendthrift And Discretionary Trusts.
Title
To Amend Provisions Of The Arkansas Trust Code Concerning Creditor Claims Against Property Held In Spendthrift And Discretionary Trusts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - Third Reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - Third Reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Notification that HB1718 is now Act 801 |
2021-04-16 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-04-15 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-04-15 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-04-05 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-01 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-01 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-01 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-30 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2021-03-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-03-11 | House | Filed |