AR HB1716 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-3)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Notification that HB1716 is now Act 520
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-3)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Notification that HB1716 is now Act 520
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Enhance Economic Opportunities In Rural Areas Of Arkansas; And To Expand The Options For Constructing And Operating Motor Vehicle Racing Facilities In Certain Rural Areas.
Title
To Enhance Economic Opportunities In Rural Areas Of Arkansas; And To Expand The Options For Constructing And Operating Motor Vehicle Racing Facilities In Certain Rural Areas.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Holcomb [R] | Sen. Blake Johnson [R] | Rep. Mark Berry [R] | Rep. Stan Berry [R] |
Rep. Kenneth Bragg [R] | Sen. Joshua Bryant [R] | Rep. Craig Christiansen [R] | Rep. Andrew Collins [D] |
Rep. Bruce Cozart [R] | Rep. Carol Dalby [R] | Rep. Jon Eubanks [R] | Rep. Ken Ferguson [D] |
Rep. Lanny Fite [R] | Rep. Jack Fortner [R] | Rep. Lane Jean [R] | Rep. Logan Jett [R] |
Rep. Jack Ladyman [R] | Rep. John Maddox [R] | Rep. Stephen Magie [D] | Rep. Mark McElroy [R] |
Rep. Jeff Wardlaw [R] | Rep. Les Warren [R] | Sen. Ben Gilmore [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | Notification that HB1716 is now Act 520 |
2021-03-31 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-03-30 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-03-30 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-03-18 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-17 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-03-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES |
2021-03-11 | House | Filed |