AR HB1716 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Notification that HB1716 is now Act 915
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Concerning Military Service And Veterans Special License Plates; And To Allow The Issuance Of Certain Special License Plates To A Surviving Spouse.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Concerning Military Service And Veterans Special License Plates; And To Allow The Issuance Of Certain Special License Plates To A Surviving Spouse.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-05 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11HouseNotification that HB1716 is now Act 915
2019-04-08HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-04-05HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-04-05HouseSenate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
2019-04-04HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
2019-03-28HouseRe-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
2019-03-28HouseReturned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2019-03-28SenateReturned To the House as passed as amended.
2019-03-28SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-27SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-27SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-03-25SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2019-03-20SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE
2019-03-20SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-20HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-19HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-06HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
2019-03-06HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback