AR HB1715 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 58-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Notification that HB1715 is now Act 736
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend Arkansas Law Concerning Absentee Ballots; To Amend Election Law; To Amend The Law Concerning Voting By Absentee Ballot; And To Amend The Law Concerning Spoiled Ballots.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend Arkansas Law Concerning Absentee Ballots; To Amend Election Law; To Amend The Law Concerning Voting By Absentee Ballot; And To Amend The Law Concerning Spoiled Ballots.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-13 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-15HouseNotification that HB1715 is now Act 736
2021-04-14HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2021-04-13HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2021-04-13HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2021-04-13SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2021-04-13SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-04-12SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-04-01SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2021-04-01SenateReceived from the House.
2021-04-01HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-03-31HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-03-29HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-29HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-03-29HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-03-15HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-15HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-03-15HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-03-11HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2021-03-11HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?tbType=&id=hb1715&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HB1715/HB1715031120211510.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HB1715/HB1715031520211130.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HB1715/HB1715032920211152.pdf
Texthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Acts/FTPDocument?path=%2FACTS%2F2021R%2FPublic%2F&file=736.pdf&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/HB1715-H1.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/HB1715-H2.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1715&rcs=2619&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1715&rcs=2748&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R

Bill Comments 750

feedback