AR HB1709 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Notification that HB1709 is now Act 668
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Regarding Nutrient Water Quality Trading Programs; And To Amend The User Fees Authorized In Establishing And Implementing A Nutrient Water Quality Trading Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Regarding Nutrient Water Quality Trading Programs; And To Amend The User Fees Authorized In Establishing And Implementing A Nutrient Water Quality Trading Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 82 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseNotification that HB1709 is now Act 668
2019-04-02HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-04-01HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-04-01HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-04-01SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2019-04-01SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-27SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-03-11SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-03-11SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-11HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-07HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-06HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-03-05HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback