AR HB1707 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Notification that HB1707 is now Act 967
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Adult And Long-term Care Facility Resident Maltreatment Act; And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Adult And Long-term Care Facility Resident Maltreatment Act; And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-08 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12HouseNotification that HB1707 is now Act 967
2019-04-09HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-04-08HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-04-08HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-04-08SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2019-04-08SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-04-08SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-04SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-03-19SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-03-19SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-19HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-03-19HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-18HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-18HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-18HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-14HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2019-03-05HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-03-05HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback