AR HB1707 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Notification that HB1707 is now Act 747
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Notification that HB1707 is now Act 747
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Arkansas Law Concerning Temporary Preprinted Paper Buyer's Tags For Motor Vehicles; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Amend Arkansas Law Concerning Temporary Preprinted Paper Buyer's Tags For Motor Vehicles; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 63 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 81 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 81 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | House | Notification that HB1707 is now Act 747 |
2013-04-03 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-04-03 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-04-03 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2013-04-02 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 |
2013-04-01 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2013-04-01 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology and Legislative Affairs |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-03-25 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-03-25 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-03-21 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-06 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2013-03-06 | House | Filed |