AR HB1706 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 39-6)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Notification that HB1706 is now Act 594
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 39-6)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Notification that HB1706 is now Act 594
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Create The Logging And Wood Fiber Transportation Job Creation Incentive Act; And To Create The Arkansas Wood Energy Products And Forest Maintenance Income Tax Credit.
Title
To Create The Logging And Wood Fiber Transportation Job Creation Incentive Act; And To Create The Arkansas Wood Energy Products And Forest Maintenance Income Tax Credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - Third Reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - Third Reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Notification that HB1706 is now Act 594 |
2021-04-05 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-04-01 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-04-01 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-03-29 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-23 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-03-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2021-03-11 | House | Filed |