AR HB1701 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Allow Creationism As A Theory Of How The Earth Came To Exist To Be Taught In Kindergarten Through Grade Twelve Classes In Public Schools And Open-enrollment Public Charter Schools.
Title
To Allow Creationism As A Theory Of How The Earth Came To Exist To Be Taught In Kindergarten Through Grade Twelve Classes In Public Schools And Open-enrollment Public Charter Schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 21 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | Senate | Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-04-07 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-06 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-03-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-03-11 | House | Filed |