AR HB1696 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Died in the House at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Died in the House at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Regarding Animals; And To Establish Liability For Damages From A Dog Bite.
Title
To Amend The Law Regarding Animals; And To Establish Liability For Damages From A Dog Bite.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 13 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-04-04 - House - Third Reading (Y: 84 N: 4 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - Third Reading (Y: 84 N: 4 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | Died in the House at Sine Die Adjournment |
2023-04-06 | House | Returned From the Senate having failed to pass. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Returned To the House as Failed to Pass |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2023-04-04 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-03-30 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-03-27 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2023-03-27 | House | Filed |