AR HB1696 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Notification that HB1696 is now Act 962
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning The Taking Of Fingerprints, A Dna Sample, And Photograph For A Person Arrested For A Class A Misdemeanor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning The Taking Of Fingerprints, A Dna Sample, And Photograph For A Person Arrested For A Class A Misdemeanor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-27HouseNotification that HB1696 is now Act 962
2021-04-23HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2021-04-22HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2021-04-22HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2021-04-22SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2021-04-22SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-04-21SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-04-12SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-04-12SenateReceived from the House.
2021-04-12HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-04-08HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-03-17HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-17HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-03-17HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-03-16HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-16HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-03-16HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-03-10HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-03-10HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?tbType=&id=hb1696&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HB1696/HB1696031020211452.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HB1696/HB1696031620211042.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HB1696/HB1696031720210949.pdf
Texthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Acts/FTPDocument?path=%2FACTS%2F2021R%2FPublic%2F&file=962.pdf&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/HB1696-H1.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/HB1696-H2.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1696&rcs=2777&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1696&rcs=3062&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R

Bill Comments 750

feedback