AR HB1693 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Notification that HB1693 is now Act 1019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Notification that HB1693 is now Act 1019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Construction Manager-general Contractor Method Of Procurement Pilot Program.
Title
To Amend The Construction Manager-general Contractor Method Of Procurement Pilot Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | House | Notification that HB1693 is now Act 1019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2019-04-10 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-04-10 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 |
2019-04-08 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-03-19 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-03-18 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-18 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-18 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-03-14 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2019-03-05 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2019-03-05 | House | Filed |