AR HB1689 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Died in Senate at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Died in Senate at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning The Award Of Attorney's Fees In Illegal Exaction Lawsuits.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning The Award Of Attorney's Fees In Illegal Exaction Lawsuits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-26 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 75 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | House | Died in Senate at Sine Die adjournment. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Died on Senate Calendar at Sine Die adjournment. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2015-03-26 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-03-25 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-25 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-24 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2 |
2015-03-23 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2015-03-19 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-03-13 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2015-03-13 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-13 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-13 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-10 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-03-05 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2015-03-05 | House | Filed |