AR HB1688 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Notification that HB1688 is now Act 677
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Notification that HB1688 is now Act 677
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Joint County And Municipal Solid Waste Disposal Act To Require That County And Municipal Members Have Budgetary Approval Authority.
Title
To Amend The Joint County And Municipal Solid Waste Disposal Act To Require That County And Municipal Members Have Budgetary Approval Authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | House | Notification that HB1688 is now Act 677 |
2021-04-06 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-04-05 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-04-05 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-03-30 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-29 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-03-16 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-16 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-16 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-10 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-03-10 | House | Filed |