AR HB1688 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Establish Cost-reporting For Assisted Living Facilities To The Department Of Human Services As A Condition Of Participation In The Arkansas Medicaid Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Establish Cost-reporting For Assisted Living Facilities To The Department Of Human Services As A Condition Of Participation In The Arkansas Medicaid Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-04 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 79 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateSine Die adjournment
2019-04-24SenateDied in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
2019-04-04SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-04-04SenateReceived from the House.
2019-04-04HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-04-03HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-04-03HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-04-03HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-04-02HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2019-03-05HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-03-05HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback