AR HB1686 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Arkansas Physician Order For Life-sustaining Treatment Act.
Title
To Amend The Arkansas Physician Order For Life-sustaining Treatment Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 48 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | House | Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment |
2021-04-14 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2021-04-12 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-12 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-12 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-04-08 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2021-03-09 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-03-09 | House | Filed |