AR HB1684 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Notification that HB1684 is now Act 844
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Allow A State-supported Institution Of Higher Education To Classify Certain Students As In-state For Purposes Of Tuition And Fees At A State-supported Institution Of Higher Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Allow A State-supported Institution Of Higher Education To Classify Certain Students As In-state For Purposes Of Tuition And Fees At A State-supported Institution Of Higher Education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-05 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 62 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 75 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10HouseNotification that HB1684 is now Act 844
2019-04-08HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-04-05HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-04-05HouseSenate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
2019-04-04HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
2019-04-03HouseRe-referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-04-03HouseReturned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2019-04-03SenateReturned To the House as passed as amended.
2019-04-03SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-02SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-04-02SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-04-02SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-04-02SenateRules suspended.
2019-04-01SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2019-03-19SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-03-19SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-19HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-18HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-18HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-18HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-14HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2019-03-05HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-03-05HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback