AR HB1679 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Notification that HB1679 is now Act 608
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning The Issuance Of An Arrest Warrant By A Judge Or Magistrate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning The Issuance Of An Arrest Warrant By A Judge Or Magistrate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseNotification that HB1679 is now Act 608
2019-03-27HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-03-26HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-03-26HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-03-26SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2019-03-26SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-25SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-03-18SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-03-18SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-18HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-14HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-04HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-03-04HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback