AR HB1678 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Notification that HB1678 is now Act 1038
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Amending Certain Licensing Requirements For A License To Carry A Concealed Handgun.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending Certain Licensing Requirements For A License To Carry A Concealed Handgun.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17HouseNotification that HB1678 is now Act 1038
2019-04-10HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-04-09HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-04-09HouseSenate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
2019-04-08HouseReturned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2019-04-08SenateReturned To the House as passed as amended.
2019-04-08SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-05SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-04-05SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-04-05SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-03-28SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2019-03-20SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-03-20SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-20HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-19HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-04HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-03-04HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback