AR HB1671 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 40-15-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Notification that HB1671 is now Act 810
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 40-15-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Notification that HB1671 is now Act 810
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Establish The Arkansas Student-athlete Publicity Rights Act.
Title
To Establish The Arkansas Student-athlete Publicity Rights Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - Third Reading (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - Third Reading (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | House | Notification that HB1671 is now Act 810 |
2021-04-15 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-04-14 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-04-14 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2021-04-13 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed as amended, Amendment #1. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Re-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-04-05 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-03-29 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-23 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-03-22 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-22 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-22 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-09 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-03-08 | House | Filed |