AR HB1670 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Notification that HB1670 is now Act 490
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Notification that HB1670 is now Act 490
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Establish Traffic Stop Safety Guidelines; And To Promote Traffic Stop Safety.
Title
To Establish Traffic Stop Safety Guidelines; And To Promote Traffic Stop Safety.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 79 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 79 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | House | Notification that HB1670 is now Act 490 |
2017-03-10 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-03-09 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-03-09 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology, and Legislative Affairs |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-03-01 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-02-28 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-02-24 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2017-02-23 | House | Filed |