AR HB1667 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Create The Universal Licensing Recognition Act.
Title
To Create The Universal Licensing Recognition Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | House | Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment |
2021-03-17 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-17 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-15 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-15 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-15 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-08 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-03-08 | House | Filed |