AR HB1665 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Notification that HB1665 is now Act 965
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Strengthen Voter Trust In The Election Process; And To Amend The Law Concerning Election Process And Administration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Strengthen Voter Trust In The Election Process; And To Amend The Law Concerning Election Process And Administration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-08 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 86 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12HouseNotification that HB1665 is now Act 965
2019-04-09HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-04-08HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-04-08HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-04-08SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2019-04-08SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-04SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-04-02SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2019-04-02SenateReceived from the House.
2019-04-02HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-04-01HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-29HouseRe-referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2019-03-29HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-29HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-29HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-28HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-28HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-28HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-27HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2019-03-04HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2019-03-04HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback