AR HB1665 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 17 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-03-17 - Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

To Create A Cause Of Action For Unauthorized Access To Another Person's Property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Create A Cause Of Action For Unauthorized Access To Another Person's Property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-17 - House of Representatives - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House of Representatives - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 67 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-17HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2017-03-17HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2017-03-17HouseSenate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
2017-03-16HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
2017-03-15HouseRe-referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2017-03-15HouseReturned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2017-03-15SenateReturned To the House as passed as amended.
2017-03-15SenateRead the third time and passed.
2017-03-14SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-03-14SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2017-03-14SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2017-03-13SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2017-03-06SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
2017-03-06SenateReceived from the House.
2017-03-06HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2017-03-03HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-03-03HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2017-03-03HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2017-03-02HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2017-03-01HouseRe-referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2017-02-28HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2017-02-23HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2017-02-23HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback