AR HB1660 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Died on House Calendar at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Department Of Finance And Administration - Disbursing Officer - Youth Entrepreneur Centers General Improvement Appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Department Of Finance And Administration - Disbursing Officer - Youth Entrepreneur Centers General Improvement Appropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-12 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 72 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-17HouseDied on House Calendar at Sine Die adjournment.
2013-04-12HouseRead the third time and failed.
2013-04-12HouseConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2013-04-12HouseRULES SUSPENDED
2013-04-04HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2013-03-26HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-03-26HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2013-03-26HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2013-03-04HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2013-03-04HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback