AR HB1652 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-13 - Notification that HB1652 is now Act 818
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-13 - Notification that HB1652 is now Act 818
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning The Procurement Of Professional Services; And To Amend The Definitions Of "construction Management" And "political Subdivision" For Purposes Of The Procurement Of Professional Services.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning The Procurement Of Professional Services; And To Amend The Definitions Of "construction Management" And "political Subdivision" For Purposes Of The Procurement Of Professional Services.
Sponsors
Rep. Les Eaves [R] | Sen. Clint Penzo [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - Third Reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - Third Reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-13 | House | Notification that HB1652 is now Act 818 |
2023-04-07 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2023-04-06 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2023-04-06 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Returned to the House as Passed. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2023-04-03 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-03-30 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-03-30 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2023-03-30 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2023-03-29 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2023-03-16 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE |
2023-03-16 | House | Filed |