AR HB1649 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Died in Senate at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Died in Senate at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
The Van Accessible Parking Act.
Title
The Van Accessible Parking Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-30 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 60 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - Motion to reconsider HB1649 passed. (Y: 69 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 39 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - Motion to reconsider HB1649 passed. (Y: 69 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 39 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | House | Died in Senate at Sine Die adjournment. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology, and Legislative Affairs |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2015-03-30 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-03-30 | House | Motion to reconsider HB1649 passed. |
2015-03-27 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2015-03-27 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-27 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-27 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-26 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2 |
2015-03-18 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES |
2015-03-18 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-18 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-05 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the first time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE JOURNAL; ENGROSSED AND ENROLLED BILLS |
2015-03-04 | House | Filed |