AR HB1647 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 61-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Promote Arkansas Voices; And To Combat Cancel Culture And Protect Freedom Of Speech.
Title
To Promote Arkansas Voices; And To Combat Cancel Culture And Protect Freedom Of Speech.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | House | WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR |
2021-04-07 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-07 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-10 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-10 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-04 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE |
2021-03-04 | House | Filed |