AR HB1647 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Notification that HB1647 is now Act 549
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend Eligibility Requirements Regarding An Applicant For The Arkansas Academic Challenge Scholarship To Include The Applicant's Superscore On The Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend Eligibility Requirements Regarding An Applicant For The Arkansas Academic Challenge Scholarship To Include The Applicant's Superscore On The Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21HouseNotification that HB1647 is now Act 549
2019-03-20HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-03-19HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-03-19HouseSenate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
2019-03-18HouseReturned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2019-03-18SenateReturned To the House as passed as amended.
2019-03-18SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-14SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-14SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-14SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-03-13SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2019-03-11SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-03-11SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-11HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-07HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-04HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-03-01HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback