AR HB1647 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Notification that HB1647 is now Act 549
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Notification that HB1647 is now Act 549
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Eligibility Requirements Regarding An Applicant For The Arkansas Academic Challenge Scholarship To Include The Applicant's Superscore On The Act.
Title
To Amend Eligibility Requirements Regarding An Applicant For The Arkansas Academic Challenge Scholarship To Include The Applicant's Superscore On The Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Fred Allen [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | House | Notification that HB1647 is now Act 549 |
2019-03-20 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2019-03-19 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-03-19 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2019-03-18 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-03-11 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-03-07 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-03-04 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-03-01 | House | Filed |