AR HB1644 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Notification that HB1644 is now Act 494
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Arkansas Economic Development Commission - Rural Services Division Appropriation For The 2019-2020 Fiscal Year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Arkansas Economic Development Commission - Rural Services Division Appropriation For The 2019-2020 Fiscal Year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 78 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15HouseNotification that HB1644 is now Act 494
2019-03-14HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-03-13HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-03-13HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-03-13SenateReturned to the House as Passed.
2019-03-13SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-03-13SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-12SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2019-03-12SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-12HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-03-12HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-07HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-04HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2019-03-01HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback