AR HB1644 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Notification that HB1644 is now Act 494
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Notification that HB1644 is now Act 494
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The Arkansas Economic Development Commission - Rural Services Division Appropriation For The 2019-2020 Fiscal Year.
Title
An Act For The Arkansas Economic Development Commission - Rural Services Division Appropriation For The 2019-2020 Fiscal Year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 78 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 78 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | House | Notification that HB1644 is now Act 494 |
2019-03-14 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2019-03-13 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-03-13 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Returned to the House as Passed. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-03-12 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2019-03-12 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-03-07 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-03-04 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE |
2019-03-01 | House | Filed |