AR HB1641 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Notification that HB1641 is now Act 450
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Notification that HB1641 is now Act 450
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Increase The Tool Allowance For Certain Employees Of The Arkansas State Highway And Transportation Department Who Work On Highway Equipment And Facilities.
Title
To Increase The Tool Allowance For Certain Employees Of The Arkansas State Highway And Transportation Department Who Work On Highway Equipment And Facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-06 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-14 | House | Notification that HB1641 is now Act 450 |
2017-03-07 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-03-06 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-03-06 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology, and Legislative Affairs |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-02-24 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-02-23 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-02-22 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2017-02-21 | House | Filed |