AR HB1640 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Died in House at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Died in House at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Require The Commission For Public School Academic Facilities And Transportation To Establish A Maximum One-way Transportation Time For School Districts.
Title
To Require The Commission For Public School Academic Facilities And Transportation To Establish A Maximum One-way Transportation Time For School Districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-18 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 45 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | House | Died in House at Sine Die adjournment. |
2015-03-18 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2015-03-17 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-03-04 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2015-03-04 | House | Filed |