AR HB1631 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Notification that HB1631 is now Act 784
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Notification that HB1631 is now Act 784
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning Maximum Speed Limits.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning Maximum Speed Limits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - House - Senate amendment # 2 read and concurred in. (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 83 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 83 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | Notification that HB1631 is now Act 784 |
2019-04-04 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2019-04-03 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-04-03 | House | Senate amendment # 2 read and concurred in. |
2019-04-03 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2019-04-02 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 & 2 |
2019-04-01 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2019-04-01 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 & 2 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Re-referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE |
2019-03-20 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-03-13 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-03-12 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-02-28 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2019-02-28 | House | Filed |