AR HB1629 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-10 - Notification that HB1629 is now Act 522
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-10 - Notification that HB1629 is now Act 522
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Rabies Control Act Related To The Confinement Of An Animal When A Person Is Bitten To Allow An Owner To Confine An Animal Who Has Received A Current Vaccination Against Rabies.
Title
To Amend The Rabies Control Act Related To The Confinement Of An Animal When A Person Is Bitten To Allow An Owner To Confine An Animal Who Has Received A Current Vaccination Against Rabies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - Third Reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - Third Reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-10 | House | Notification that HB1629 is now Act 522 |
2023-04-05 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2023-04-05 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2023-04-05 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Returned to the House as Passed. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2023-03-28 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-03-27 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-03-27 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2023-03-27 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2023-03-16 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2023-03-14 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2023-03-14 | House | Filed |