AR HB1627 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 40-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-10 - Notification that HB1627 is now Act 521
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 40-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-10 - Notification that HB1627 is now Act 521
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Clarify That Membership Dues Paid To Hunting Or Fishing Clubs Are Exempt From Sales Tax.
Title
To Clarify That Membership Dues Paid To Hunting Or Fishing Clubs Are Exempt From Sales Tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - Third Reading (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - Third Reading (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-10 | House | Notification that HB1627 is now Act 521 |
2023-04-05 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2023-04-05 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2023-04-05 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Returned to the House as Passed. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2023-03-29 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-03-28 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-03-14 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2023-03-14 | House | Filed |