AR HB1625 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Died in the House at Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Died in the House at Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Create The Right To Know Your Pay Act.
Title
To Create The Right To Know Your Pay Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Leding [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 7 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 16 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 80 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 16 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 80 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | House | Died in the House at Sine Die |
2017-04-03 | House | Returned From the Senate having failed to pass. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Returned To the House as Having Failed to Pass. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | FAILURE of HB 1625 on March 30, 2017, EXPUNGED. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Returned From the House as requested. |
2017-03-31 | House | Returned To the Senate as requested. |
2017-03-30 | House | Returned From the Senate having failed to pass. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Returned To the House as Having Failed to Pass. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-03-27 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-23 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-23 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-21 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2017-02-21 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-02-21 | House | Filed |