AR HB1623 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Notification that HB1623 is now Act 616
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Notification that HB1623 is now Act 616
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Provide The Attorney General Notice And The Opportunity To Intervene In All Qui Tam Lawsuits Involving State Funds Brought Under The Federal False Claims Act.
Title
To Provide The Attorney General Notice And The Opportunity To Intervene In All Qui Tam Lawsuits Involving State Funds Brought Under The Federal False Claims Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | House | Notification that HB1623 is now Act 616 |
2021-04-06 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-04-05 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-04-05 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-03-15 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-11 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-03-03 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-03-03 | House | Filed |