AR HB1623 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Notification that HB1623 is now Act 1107
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Notification that HB1623 is now Act 1107
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Freedom Of Information Act Of 1967; To Amend The Law Concerning Information For Public Guidance; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Amend The Freedom Of Information Act Of 1967; To Amend The Law Concerning Information For Public Guidance; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-31 - Senate - Emergency Clause failed of adoption. (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - Senate - EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 79 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - Senate - EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 79 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | House | Notification that HB1623 is now Act 1107 |
2017-04-03 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-03-31 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-03-31 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2017-03-31 | Senate | The vote by which the emergency clause FAILED was EXPUNGED. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Emergency Clause failed of adoption. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | The vote by which HB 1623 FAILED on March 29, 2017, was EXPUNGED. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Returned From the House as requested. |
2017-03-30 | House | Returned To the Senate as requested. |
2017-03-29 | House | Returned From the Senate having failed to pass. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Returned To the House as Having Failed to Pass. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-03-27 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2017-03-27 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-22 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-17 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-17 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-17 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-02-21 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2017-02-21 | House | Filed |